+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2015: Passed (Senate)
January 27, 2015: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor