+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: PP To AP
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Property;Appropriations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Public Property
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
February 11, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor