+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 12, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor