+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: GB To YF
- DR - TSDPCS: YF To GB
- DR - TSDPCS: GB To YF
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- DR - TSDPCS: YF To GB
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Youth and Family Affairs;Revenue and Expenditure General Bills
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor