+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
- DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Education