+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means