+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: AP To AE
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: AE To AP
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Apportionment and Elections;Appropriations