+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Kirby,Burton,Blount
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Conferees Named Mims,Barker,Mayo
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Holland, Mims, Barker, Mayo)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2015: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 31, 2015: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 5, 2015: Passed As Amended (Senate)
January 20, 2015: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor