+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means