+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Tourism
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2018: Passed (Senate)
January 31, 2018: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor