+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation