+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 9, 2020 in the House:
- Law W/out Governor's Signature
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- Amended
- Immediate Release
- Returned For Concurrence
On July 1, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
- Immediate Release
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On June 28, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Eure, Turner, Currie)
- Passed
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
- Suspend from Deadlines by HC 69
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
July 1, 2020: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
July 1, 2020: Passed As Amended (Senate)
June 28, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor