+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 8, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On July 1, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate Release
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Immediate Release
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
- Suspend from Deadlines by HC 69
+ − Votes (3)
July 1, 2020: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
July 1, 2020: Passed As Amended (Senate)
June 25, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor