+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 6, 2020 in the House:
- Died In Conference
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Hopson,Wiggins,Polk
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,White,Barton
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (2)
June 12, 2020: Passed As Amended (Senate)
June 2, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor