+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2019: Passed (Senate)
March 20, 2019: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor