+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means