+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2019: Passed (Senate)
March 22, 2019: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor