+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Law W/out Governor's Signature
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
+ − Votes (2)
April 5, 2022: Passed (Senate)
March 24, 2022: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor