+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
+ − Vote
March 27, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor