+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
+ − Vote
April 6, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor