+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate Release
On August 10, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate Release
- Veto Overridden
On August 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
On July 8, 2020 in the House:
- Partially Vetoed By Governor
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
- Recommitted For Further Conf
- Reconsidered
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Recommitted For Further Conf
On June 28, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Hopson,DeBar,Blackwell
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,Bennett,Ladner
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (5)
August 10, 2020: Veto Overridden (Senate)
June 30, 2020: Conference Report Adopted (House)
June 30, 2020: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
June 12, 2020: Passed As Amended (Senate)
May 27, 2020: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor