+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 25, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2018: Passed (Senate)
March 15, 2018: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Snowden
Type:
Primary Sponsor