+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Reconsidered
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Moore, Roberson)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Education