+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Frierson, Huddleston (15th))
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,McDaniel,Collins
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Mims,Clarke
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Holland, Frierson, Huddleston (15th))
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Point of Order Withdrawn
- Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair
- Point of Order Raised
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 31, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 14, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 20, 2013: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor