+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- Died In Conference
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Gollott,Hopson
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,DeLano,Huddleston (15th)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Passed As Amended
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
March 9, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor