+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 30, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Horhn,Blount
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Johnson,Watson
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 31, 2013: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 14, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 20, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor