+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Jackson (15th),Branning
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,Snowden,Beckett
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2019: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 27, 2019: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 14, 2019: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 19, 2019: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor