+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Approved by Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 17, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Wilemon,Tollison
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Myers
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
April 17, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (House)
April 17, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 23, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
March 9, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor