+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Paden, Mims, Johnson (87th))
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: GB To PH
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: PH To GB
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services;Revenue and Expenditure General Bills
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
February 2, 2017: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor