+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 21, 2017: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor