+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 30, 2013 in the House:
- Died In Conference
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Fillingane,Brown,Hudson
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees Named Smith (39th),Rogers (61st),Baker
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 19, 2013: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor