+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: LP To FI
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private;Finance
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2013: Passed (Senate)
February 26, 2013: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor