+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations