+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Vote
February 20, 2019: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor