+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: WM To LP
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: LP To WM
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation;Ways and Means
+ − Votes (2)
April 16, 2016: Passed (Senate)
April 6, 2016: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor