+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- Died In Conference
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Hudson
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Conferees Named Smith,Lamar,Reynolds
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means