+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2022: Passed (Senate)
February 3, 2022: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor