+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2018: Passed (Senate)
February 13, 2018: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor