+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2019: Passed (Senate)
February 26, 2019: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Snowden
Type:
Primary Sponsor