+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 9, 2020 in the House:
- Law W/out Governor's Signature
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate Release
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Doty,Boyd,Kirby
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Bain,Yates,White
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2020: Conference Report Adopted (House)
June 30, 2020: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
June 16, 2020: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 27, 2020: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Gunn
Type:
Primary Sponsor