+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled Subject To Call
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 13, 2019: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor