+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Lee,Simmons (13th)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Johnson,Barker
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Immediate Release
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2015: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 29, 2015: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 17, 2015: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 18, 2015: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor