+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
+ − Vote
February 26, 2014: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor