+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Moak, Smith (39th), Rogers (61st))
- Passed
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means