+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hughes, Gipson, Hood)
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Passed As Amended
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Straughter, Gipson, Hood)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2016: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
March 31, 2016: Motion to Reconsider Tabled (Senate)
March 30, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 19, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Gunn
Type:
Primary Sponsor