+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services