+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Simmons (13th),Younger
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Conferees Named Read,Eure,Turner
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
March 26, 2017: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 26, 2017: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 14, 2017: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 15, 2017: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor