+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Kirby,Boyd,Michel
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Mims,Shanks,White
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Faulkner, Mims, McGee)
- Passed
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2022: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 29, 2022: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 9, 2022: Passed As Amended (Senate)
January 27, 2022: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Gunn
Type:
Primary Sponsor