+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in Amend From Senate
On March 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- Referred To Local and Private
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Passed
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2021: Concurred in Amend From Senate (House)
March 24, 2021: Passed As Amended (Senate)
March 18, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor