+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2021: Passed (Senate)
March 11, 2021: Passed (House)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor